TX HB15 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the Texas brain university research initiative.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the Texas brain university research initiative.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#480 (Y: 107 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#467 (Y: 114 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#466 (Y: 66 N: 80 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#465 (Y: 63 N: 72 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - House - RV#464 (Y: 115 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-05-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-25SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-22SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-19SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-17SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-04-28SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-28HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-28HouseRecord vote RV#480
2021-04-28HousePassed
2021-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-27HouseRecord vote RV#467
2021-04-27HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-27HouseRecord vote RV#466
2021-04-27HouseAmendment fails of adoption 3-Slaton
2021-04-27HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2021-04-27HouseAmendment(s) offered 3-Slaton
2021-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-27HouseRecord vote RV#465
2021-04-27HouseAmendment fails of adoption 2-Cason
2021-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-27HouseRecord vote RV#464
2021-04-27HouseAmended 1-S. Thompson
2021-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-27HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2021-04-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-15HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Higher Education
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2021-02-24HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

HJR5 (Enabling for) 2021-05-10 - Referred to Health & Human Services

Subjects

BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE
BRAIN INSTITUTE OF TEXAS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
DELL MEDICAL SCHOOL AT THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT AUSTIN
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
Governor
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
HISTORICALLY UNDERUTILIZED BUSINESSES
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
PUBLIC FINANCE AUTHORITY, TEXAS
SAM HOUSTON STATE UNIVERSITY COLLEGE OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY HEALTH SCIENCE CENTER
TEXAS TECH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER
TEXAS TECH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER AT EL PASO
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON COLLEGE OF MEDICINE
UNIVERSITY OF NORTH TEXAS HEALTH SCIENCE CENTER AT FT. WORTH
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS HEALTH SCIENCE CENTER AT HOUSTON
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS HEALTH SCIENCE CENTER AT SAN ANTONIO
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS HEALTH SCIENCE CENTER AT TYLER
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS MD ANDERSON CANCER CENTER
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS MEDICAL BRANCH AT GALVESTON
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS RIO GRANDE VALLEY SCHOOL OF MEDICINE
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SOUTHWESTERN MEDICAL CENTER

Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB15
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00015I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00015H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00015E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00015S.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00015H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00015H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00015H23.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00015I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00015H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00015H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00015E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00015E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00015S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00015S.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB15&RcdVtNo=464&Ch=H&Dt=04/27/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB15&RcdVtNo=465&Ch=H&Dt=04/27/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB15&RcdVtNo=466&Ch=H&Dt=04/27/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB15&RcdVtNo=467&Ch=H&Dt=04/27/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB15&RcdVtNo=480&Ch=H&Dt=04/28/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback