TX HB15 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 86-2)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 86-2)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to informed consent to an abortion.
Title
Relating to informed consent to an abortion.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-05-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-09 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-09 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-07 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-06 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-05 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2011-05-05 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-05 | Record vote | |
2011-05-05 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-05-05 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-05 | Record vote | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to table prevails | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to refuse to concur in Senate amdts. | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to concur in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-04 | Co-sponsor authorized | |
2011-05-03 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-03 | Record vote | |
2011-05-03 | Passed as amended | |
2011-05-03 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-03 | Amended | |
2011-05-03 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-03 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-03 | Record vote | |
2011-05-03 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-02 | Record vote | |
2011-05-02 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-02 | Record vote | |
2011-05-02 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2011-05-02 | Record vote | |
2011-05-02 | Amendment to amendment tabled | |
2011-05-02 | Amendment to amendment offered | |
2011-05-02 | Record vote | |
2011-05-02 | Amendment to amendment tabled | |
2011-05-02 | Amendment to amendment offered | |
2011-05-02 | Record vote | |
2011-05-02 | Amendment to amendment tabled | |
2011-05-02 | Amendment to amendment offered | |
2011-05-02 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-02 | Amendment amended | |
2011-05-02 | Amendment to amendment offered | |
2011-05-02 | Record vote | |
2011-05-02 | Amendment to amendment tabled | |
2011-05-02 | Amendment to amendment offered | |
2011-05-02 | Record vote | |
2011-05-02 | Amendment to amendment tabled | |
2011-05-02 | Amendment to amendment offered | |
2011-05-02 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-02 | Record vote | |
2011-05-02 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-28 | Co-sponsor authorized | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-19 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-18 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-13 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-13 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-12 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-04-11 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-05 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-04-05 | Read first time | |
2011-03-08 | Received from the House | |
2011-03-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-07 | Record vote | |
2011-03-07 | Passed | |
2011-03-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-03 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amended | |
2011-03-03 | Vote reconsidered | |
2011-03-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-03 | Amended | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-03 | Amended | |
2011-03-03 | Amended | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment to amendment tabled | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment to amendment tabled | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-03-03 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-03 | Amended | |
2011-03-03 | Amended | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-03 | Point of order withdrawn | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-03-03 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-03 | Amended | |
2011-03-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment to amendment fails of adoption | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-03-03 | Point of order overruled | |
2011-03-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment fails of adoption | |
2011-03-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-03 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-03 | Amended | |
2011-03-03 | Record vote | |
2011-03-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-03-03 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-03 | Placed on Emergency Calendar | |
2011-03-02 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-03-02 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-03-02 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-02 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-02 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-02 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-02 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-03-02 | Record vote | |
2011-03-02 | Rules suspended | |
2011-03-02 | Recommitted to committee | |
2011-03-02 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-03-02 | Point of order withdrawn | |
2011-03-02 | Point of order withdrawn | |
2011-03-02 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-03-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-02 | Placed on Emergency Calendar | |
2011-02-28 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-02-28 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-02-25 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-02-25 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-02-23 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-02-23 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-02-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-02-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-11 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-02-11 | Read first time | |
2011-02-11 | Filed |