TX HB1480 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the protection of animal and crop facilities; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the protection of animal and crop facilities; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1687 (Y: 136 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1124 (Y: 136 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1687
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenatePassed
2021-05-27SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-27SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-17SenateReferred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
2021-05-17SenateRead first time
2021-05-17SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-14HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1124
2021-05-14HousePassed
2021-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-13HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-13HouseAmended 2-Zwiener
2021-05-13HouseAmended 1-Rosenthal
2021-05-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-11HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-03-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Agriculture & Livestock
2021-03-05HouseRead first time
2021-01-29HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB472 (Same As) 2021-05-13 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1480
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01480I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01480E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01480S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01480F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01480H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01480H22.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01480I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01480H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01480E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01480E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01480S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01480S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01480F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1480&RcdVtNo=1124&Ch=H&Dt=05/14/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1480&RcdVtNo=1687&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=234

Bill Comments

feedback