TX HB1477 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of grants under the emergency medical services assistance program and the distribution of certain revenue received by the comptroller.
Title
Relating to the use of grants under the emergency medical services assistance program and the distribution of certain revenue received by the comptroller.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1302 (Y: 122 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1302 |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
SCHOLARSHIPS
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
SCHOLARSHIPS
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF