TX HB1451 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the public high school graduation credit requirements for a language other than English.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the public high school graduation credit requirements for a language other than English.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09HouseLaid on the table subject to call
2017-05-09HouseCompanion considered in lieu of
2017-05-09HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-26HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-20HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-20HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-20HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-07HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-03-07HouseRead first time
2017-02-01HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback