TX HB1449 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to child custody evaluations and adoption evaluations conducted and testimony provided in certain suits affecting the parent-child relationship; providing penalties; creating an offense; authorizing fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to child custody evaluations and adoption evaluations conducted and testimony provided in certain suits affecting the parent-child relationship; providing penalties; creating an offense; authorizing fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-08 - House - HB 1449Third Reading House (Y: 120 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - HB 1449Third Reading House (Y: 105 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-20 Effective on 9/1/15
2015-06-20 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2015-05-26HouseSenate passage reported
2015-05-26SenateRecord vote
2015-05-26SenatePassed
2015-05-26SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-26SenateRecord vote
2015-05-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2015-05-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2015-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2015-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-11SenateReferred to State Affairs
2015-05-11SenateRead first time
2015-05-11SenateReceived from the House
2015-05-11HouseReported engrossed
2015-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-08HouseRecord vote
2015-05-08HousePassed
2015-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-07HouseRecord vote
2015-05-07HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2015-05-07HouseAmended
2015-05-07HouseAmended
2015-05-07HouseAmended
2015-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-07HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-05-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-23HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-04-23HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-23HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-04-23HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2015-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-04HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2015-03-04HouseRead first time
2015-02-16HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback