TX HB1434 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to limitations on pelvic examinations; authorizing disciplinary action, including an administrative penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to limitations on pelvic examinations; authorizing disciplinary action, including an administrative penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#501 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-05-04SenateRead first time
2021-04-28SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-28HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-28HouseRecord vote RV#501
2021-04-28HousePassed
2021-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-27HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-27HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-07HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-07HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-03-05HouseRead first time
2021-01-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB53 (Similar To) 2021-03-03 - Referred to Health & Human Services

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback