TX HB1422 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to the requirements for a funeral establishment license.
Title
Relating to the requirements for a funeral establishment license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-21 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-16 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-02 | Referred to Public Health | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time | |
2009-02-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB755 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
FUNERALS & FUNERAL DIRECTORS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
FUNERALS & FUNERAL DIRECTORS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions