TX HB142 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 14 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the offense of indecent assault, to judicial protection for victims of that offense, and to certain criminal acts committed in relation to that offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the offense of indecent assault, to judicial protection for victims of that offense, and to certain criminal acts committed in relation to that offense.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-03-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-03-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-03-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-13HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-03-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-13HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-02-13HouseRead first time
2016-11-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback