TX HB1407 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the establishment of the emergency medical services assistance program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the establishment of the emergency medical services assistance program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1834 (Y: 130 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#771 (Y: 128 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-26HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-25SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-25HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-25HouseRecord vote
2017-05-25HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-24HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-24HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenatePassed
2017-05-23SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenateAmended
2017-05-23SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-23SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-17SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-10SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-10SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-09SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-05SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-05-05SenateRead first time
2017-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HousePassed
2017-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-03HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-26HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2017-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-11HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-14HouseReferred to Public Health
2017-03-14HouseRead first time
2017-02-01HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback