TX HB1404 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-21 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-21 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain temporary orders in a suit affecting the parent-child relationship during a parent's military deployment.
Title
Relating to certain temporary orders in a suit affecting the parent-child relationship during a parent's military deployment.
Sponsors
Rep. Leo Berman [R] | Rep. Allen Fletcher [R] | Sen. Chris Harris [R] | Rep. Ken Legler [R] |
Rep. Debbie Riddle [R] | Rep. Ralph Sheffield [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-21 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-05-21 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-11 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-11 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-11 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-10 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-10 | Record vote | |
2011-05-10 | Passed | |
2011-05-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-10 | Record vote | |
2011-05-10 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-10 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-10 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-10 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-12 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-09 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-05 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-03 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-03 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-03 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-03 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2011-04-14 | Read first time | |
2011-04-04 | Received from the House | |
2011-03-31 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-31 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-31 | Record vote | |
2011-03-31 | Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-30 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-30 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-03-28 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-03-21 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-03-21 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-07 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2011-03-01 | Read first time | |
2011-02-16 | Filed |