TX HB14 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-9)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a student loan repayment assistance program for certain full-time peace officers in this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a student loan repayment assistance program for certain full-time peace officers in this state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#468 (Y: 128 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Amended RV#433 (Y: 130 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateReferred to Higher Education
2019-04-25SenateRead first time
2019-04-23SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-17HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17HouseRecord vote RV#468
2019-04-17HousePassed
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#433
2019-04-16HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-16HouseAmended 1-Stucky
2019-04-16HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-03HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-05HouseReferred to Higher Education
2019-03-05HouseRead first time
2019-03-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB16 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback