TX HB14 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - House appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - House appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Texas emissions reduction plan.
Title
Relating to the Texas emissions reduction plan.
Sponsors
Rep. Geanie Morrison [R] | Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] | Sen. Kirk Watson [D] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] |
Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-08 - House - HB 14Third Reading House (Y: 130 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - HB 14Third Reading House (Y: 136 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - HB 14Third Reading House (Y: 136 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2015-05-29 | House | House appoints conferees |
2015-05-29 | House | House requests conference committee |
2015-05-29 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-08 | House | Passed |
2015-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-07 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-07 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-07 | House | Amended |
2015-05-07 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-06 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-04 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2015-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BELL COUNTY
Environment
Environment--Air
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
MCLENNAN COUNTY
VEHICLE EMISSIONS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
WEBB COUNTY
Environment
Environment--Air
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
MCLENNAN COUNTY
VEHICLE EMISSIONS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
WEBB COUNTY