TX HB14 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the eligibility for unemployment benefits of a person receiving certain forms of remuneration.
Title
Relating to the eligibility for unemployment benefits of a person receiving certain forms of remuneration.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Eltife [R] | Rep. Patricia Harless [R] | Rep. Dan Huberty [R] | Rep. Susan King [R] |
Rep. Jim Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-25 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-19 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-18 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-13 | Referred to Economic Development | |
2011-05-13 | Read first time | |
2011-05-13 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-12 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-12 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-12 | Record vote | |
2011-05-12 | Passed | |
2011-05-12 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-12 | Record vote | |
2011-05-12 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-05-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-11 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-06 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-21 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-01 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-03-31 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-31 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-29 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-29 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | |
2011-03-07 | Read first time | |
2011-03-03 | Filed |