TX HB1389 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the placement on community supervision, including deferred adjudication community supervision, of a defendant who is the primary caretaker of a child.
Title
Relating to the placement on community supervision, including deferred adjudication community supervision, of a defendant who is the primary caretaker of a child.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#88 (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-03-26 | House | Record vote RV#88 |
2019-03-26 | House | Passed |
2019-03-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-25 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-03-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-03-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
Family
Family--Parent & Child
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
Family
Family--Parent & Child
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION