TX HB1387 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the storage of firearms and ammunition in the same locked location in certain foster homes.
Title
Relating to the storage of firearms and ammunition in the same locked location in certain foster homes.
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Harris [R] | Rep. Candy Noble [R] | Rep. William Metcalf [R] | Rep. Steve Toth [R] |
Sen. Brian Birdwell [R] | Sen. Charles Creighton [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#382 (Y: 98 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#356 (Y: 92 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#355 (Y: 62 N: 83 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#382 (Y: 98 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#356 (Y: 92 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#355 (Y: 62 N: 83 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-04 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-21 | House | Record vote RV#382 |
2021-04-21 | House | Passed |
2021-04-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-20 | House | Record vote RV#356 |
2021-04-20 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-20 | House | Record vote RV#355 |
2021-04-20 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 1-Meza |
2021-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-27 | House | Filed |