TX HB1387 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Considered in Calendars
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Considered in Calendars
Summary
Relating to hearing requirements for the adoption of certain rules by a board of trustees of certain school districts.
Title
Relating to hearing requirements for the adoption of certain rules by a board of trustees of certain school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-14 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-09 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-02 | Referred to Public Education | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time | |
2009-02-18 | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Elections
Elections--School District
PUBLIC NOTICE
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Elections
Elections--School District
PUBLIC NOTICE