TX HB1363 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the civil prosecution of offenses involving certain municipal parking ordinances; authorizing a civil fine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the civil prosecution of offenses involving certain municipal parking ordinances; authorizing a civil fine.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseReturned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
2019-05-10HouseWithdrawn from calendar (contested)
2019-05-10HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-24HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-18HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Urban Affairs
2019-02-27HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback