TX HB136 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to inclusion of career and technology education in the mission of public education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to inclusion of career and technology education in the mission of public education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1772 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#628 (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-01 Effective immediately
2017-06-01 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-22HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-22HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-22HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenatePassed
2017-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateAmended
2017-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-19SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2017-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-05SenateReferred to Education
2017-05-05SenateRead first time
2017-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-03HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03HouseRecord vote
2017-05-03HousePassed
2017-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-02HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-02HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-21HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-03-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-13HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-02-13HouseRead first time
2016-11-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback