TX HB1359 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the date on which certain criminal defendants are eligible to file a petition for an order of nondisclosure.
Title
Relating to the date on which certain criminal defendants are eligible to file a petition for an order of nondisclosure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-07 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2013-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-15 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Criminal Procedure--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB1359 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB01359I.htm |