TX HB1358 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the Cancer Prevention and Research Institute of Texas.
Title
Relating to the Cancer Prevention and Research Institute of Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-25 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-23 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-23 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-21 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-21 | Record vote | |
2009-05-21 | Passed | |
2009-05-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-21 | Record vote | |
2009-05-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-21 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-21 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-20 | Co-sponsor authorized | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-13 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-13 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-13 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-12 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-08 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-05-08 | Read first time | |
2009-05-08 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-07 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-07 | Record vote | |
2009-05-07 | Passed | |
2009-05-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-06 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-06 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-06 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2009-05-06 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-05-05 | Postponed | |
2009-05-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-04 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-02 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-24 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-23 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-09 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-09 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-17 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-17 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-02 | Referred to Public Health | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time | |
2009-02-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB895 (Same As) 2009-03-09 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
CANCER PREVENTION & RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF TEXAS
Health
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Health
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions