TX HB1356 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-10 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-10 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the carrying of concealed handguns on certain premises of or locations associated with schools or institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to the carrying of concealed handguns on certain premises of or locations associated with schools or institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-10 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-09 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-27 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-27 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-27 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-16 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-16 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-16 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | |
2011-03-01 | Read first time | |
2011-02-15 | Filed |