TX HB1345 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-05 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-05 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the statute of limitations on prosecution of the offenses of kidnapping and aggravated kidnapping of a minor.
Title
Relating to the statute of limitations on prosecution of the offenses of kidnapping and aggravated kidnapping of a minor.
Sponsors
Rep. Marc Veasey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-05-05 | Read first time | |
2011-05-04 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-04 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-03 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-03 | Record vote | |
2011-05-03 | Passed | |
2011-05-03 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-03 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-03 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-03 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-03 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-29 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-27 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-26 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-26 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-26 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-26 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-05 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2011-03-01 | Read first time | |
2011-02-14 | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB1345 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB01345I.htm |