TX HB1339 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of certain water districts to hold meetings by teleconference or videoconference.
Title
Relating to the authority of certain water districts to hold meetings by teleconference or videoconference.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-03-26 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2013-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Open Meetings
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--River Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.
TELECONFERENCING
VIDEOCONFERENCING
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--River Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.
TELECONFERENCING
VIDEOCONFERENCING
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB1339 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB01339I.htm |