TX HB1339 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the student fees for the university center at Midwestern State University.
Title
Relating to the student fees for the university center at Midwestern State University.
Sponsors
Rep. Lanham Lyne [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2011-05-13 | Companion considered in lieu of | |
2011-05-13 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-12 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-02 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-02 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-02 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-29 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-29 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-29 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2011-03-01 | Read first time | |
2011-02-14 | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB1339 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB01339I.htm |