TX HB1325 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the production and regulation of hemp; requiring occupational licenses; authorizing fees; creating criminal offenses; providing civil and administrative penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the production and regulation of hemp; requiring occupational licenses; authorizing fees; creating criminal offenses; providing civil and administrative penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#609 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-16HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-15HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenatePassed
2019-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateAmended
2019-05-15SenateAmendment(s) offered FA3 Rodríguez
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateAmended
2019-05-15SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Perry
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateAmended
2019-05-15SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Perry
2019-05-15SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-15SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-14SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-13SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-07SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-07SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-06SenatePosting rule suspended
2019-05-06SenateMeeting cancelled
2019-05-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-06SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-03SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-01SenateReferred to Agriculture
2019-05-01SenateRead first time
2019-04-24SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-24HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-24HouseRecord vote RV#609
2019-04-24HousePassed
2019-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-23HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-23HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-23HouseAmended 1-T. King
2019-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-09HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-09HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Agriculture & Livestock
2019-02-27HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback