TX HB1316 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the disclosure in a criminal case of certain criminal history record information.
Title
Relating to the disclosure in a criminal case of certain criminal history record information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Electronic Information Systems
Law Enforcement
Criminal Procedure--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Electronic Information Systems
Law Enforcement
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1316 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01316I.htm |