TX HB131 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to exempting the intrastate manufacture of a firearm, a firearm accessory, or ammunition from federal regulation.
Title
Relating to exempting the intrastate manufacture of a firearm, a firearm accessory, or ammunition from federal regulation.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Krause [R] | Rep. William Metcalf [R] | Rep. Trent Ashby [R] | Rep. Jay Dean [R] |
Rep. Cole Hefner [R] | Rep. Mark Keough [R] | Rep. Jeff Leach [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2017-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2016-11-14 | House | Filed |