TX HB13 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-9)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the establishment of the Texas Energy Disaster Reliability Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the establishment of the Texas Energy Disaster Reliability Council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - House - Read 3rd time RV#62 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#54 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-03SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-08SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-04-08SenateRead first time
2021-03-31SenateReceived from the House
2021-03-31HouseReported engrossed
2021-03-31HouseRecord vote RV#62
2021-03-31HousePassed
2021-03-31HouseRead 3rd time
2021-03-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-03-30HouseRecord vote RV#54
2021-03-30HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-03-30HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2021-03-30HouseAmended 4-Zwiener
2021-03-30HouseAmended 3-Martinez Fischer
2021-03-30HouseAmended 2-Paddie
2021-03-30HouseAmended 1-Paddie
2021-03-30HouseRead 2nd time
2021-03-30HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-03-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-03-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-11HouseRead first time
2021-03-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB13
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00013I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00013H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00013E.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00013H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00013H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00013H23.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00013H24.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00013I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00013H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00013H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00013E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00013E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB13&RcdVtNo=54&Ch=H&Dt=03/30/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB13&RcdVtNo=62&Ch=H&Dt=03/31/2021

Bill Comments

feedback