TX HB1298 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the definition of commercial property insurance for purposes of certain provisions governing insurance rates and policy forms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the definition of commercial property insurance for purposes of certain provisions governing insurance rates and policy forms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#915 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-29 Effective immediately
2017-05-29 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenatePassed
2017-05-23SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-23SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-12SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-05-12SenateRead first time
2017-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HousePassed
2017-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-05HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-03-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-03-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-03-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-21HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-03-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-27HouseReferred to Insurance
2017-02-27HouseRead first time
2017-01-25HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback