TX HB1290 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the required repeal of a state agency rule and a government growth impact statement before adoption of a new state agency rule.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the required repeal of a state agency rule and a government growth impact statement before adoption of a new state agency rule.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2012 (Y: 119 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Passed (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#887 (Y: 114 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - Amended RV#854 (Y: 89 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-28SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-28HouseRecord vote
2017-05-28HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2017-05-28HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2017-05-27HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2017-05-27SenateConference committee report filed
2017-05-26HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-26HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-26SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-26SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2017-05-25SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-25SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-25SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-25HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-25HouseHouse requests conference committee
2017-05-25HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2017-05-24HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-24HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-24HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenatePassed
2017-05-23SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenateAmendment adopted as amended
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenateAmendment amended
2017-05-23SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenateAmendment amended
2017-05-23SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2017-05-23SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-23SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-23SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-22SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-22SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-19SenateReferred to Administration
2017-05-19SenateRereferred to committee
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-05-18SenateRead first time
2017-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HousePassed
2017-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-05HouseRecord vote
2017-05-05HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-05HouseAmended
2017-05-05HouseAmended
2017-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-12HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-22HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-22HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-22HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-13HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-03-13HouseRead first time
2017-01-25HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1290
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01290I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01290H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01290E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01290S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01290F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1290&RcdVtNo=854&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1290&RcdVtNo=887&Ch=H&Dt=05/06/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-23-F.PDF#page=106
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1290&RcdVtNo=2012&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=57

Bill Comments

feedback