TX HB1249 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a prohibition of certain motor vehicles resembling emergency medical services vehicles; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a prohibition of certain motor vehicles resembling emergency medical services vehicles; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#913 (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-29 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-05-29 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-22HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-20HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenatePassed
2017-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-19SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-08SenateReferred to Transportation
2017-05-08SenateRead first time
2017-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HousePassed
2017-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-05HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-28HouseTransferred to Calendars Committee
2017-04-28HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-27HouseReturned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
2017-04-27HouseWithdrawn from calendar
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-19HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-12HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-30HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-30HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-27HouseReferred to Transportation
2017-02-27HouseRead first time
2017-01-24HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback