TX HB1233 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the documentary fee charged in connection with the sale of certain recreational vehicles and boats.
Title
Relating to the documentary fee charged in connection with the sale of certain recreational vehicles and boats.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2013-04-30 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2013-04-30 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-22 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-03-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Investments & Financial Services |
2013-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BOATS & BOATING
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
CONSUMER CREDIT COMMISSIONER, OFFICE OF
FINANCE COMMISSION OF TEXAS
Financial
Financial--General
MOTORCYCLES
RECREATIONAL & ALL-TERRAIN VEHICLES
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
CONSUMER CREDIT COMMISSIONER, OFFICE OF
FINANCE COMMISSION OF TEXAS
Financial
Financial--General
MOTORCYCLES
RECREATIONAL & ALL-TERRAIN VEHICLES
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General