TX HB1227 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to eliminating the requirement that a school district assess the physical fitness of students.
Title
Relating to eliminating the requirement that a school district assess the physical fitness of students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2015-03-03 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--School Districts
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--School Districts
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety