TX HB122 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the medical use of marihuana; providing an affirmative defense to prosecution for possession of marihuana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the medical use of marihuana; providing an affirmative defense to prosecution for possession of marihuana.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseLeft pending in subcommittee
2019-04-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
2019-04-11HouseConsidered by s/c in public hearing
2019-04-11HouseScheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
2019-04-08HousePosting rule suspended
2019-03-13HouseReferred directly to subcommittee by chair
2019-02-12HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-02-12HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback