TX HB1219 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 43-4)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Recommitted to committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the dissolution by petition of a municipal management district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the dissolution by petition of a municipal management district.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27HouseRecommitted to committee
2021-04-28HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-04HouseReferred to Urban Affairs
2021-03-04HouseRead first time
2021-01-20HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback