TX HB1218 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution of and punishment for the offense of prostitution.
Title
Relating to the prosecution of and punishment for the offense of prostitution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Morals
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
PROSTITUTION
Crimes--Against Morals
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
PROSTITUTION
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1218 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01218I.htm |