TX HB1216 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to orders of nondisclosure for certain victims of trafficking of persons or compelling prostitution.
Title
Relating to orders of nondisclosure for certain victims of trafficking of persons or compelling prostitution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1801 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
CRIME VICTIMS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Morals
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
PROSTITUTION
CRIME VICTIMS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Morals
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
PROSTITUTION