TX HB121 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-23 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-23 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation by a municipality or county of certain employment benefits and policies.
Title
Relating to the regulation by a municipality or county of certain employment benefits and policies.
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Vasut [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB563 (Same As) 2023-02-17 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB563 (Same As) 2023-02-17 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB130 (Similar To) 2023-04-14 - Referred to State Affairs
SB563 (Same As) 2023-02-17 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB130 (Similar To) 2023-04-14 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
EMPLOYEE BENEFITS & LEAVE
Labor
Labor--General
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
EMPLOYEE BENEFITS & LEAVE
Labor
Labor--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB121 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB00121I.htm |