TX HB121 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
Summary
Relating to the fee for issuance of specialty license plates to certain wounded peace officers and to the families of certain peace officers killed in the line of duty.
Title
Relating to the fee for issuance of specialty license plates to certain wounded peace officers and to the families of certain peace officers killed in the line of duty.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Heflin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2009-05-14 | Read first time | |
2009-05-13 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-13 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-12 | Record vote | |
2009-05-12 | Passed | |
2009-05-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-12 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-05 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-30 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-30 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-30 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-30 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-28 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-02 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-04-02 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-04-02 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-04-02 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-27 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-27 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-02-12 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-02-12 | Read first time | |
2008-11-10 | Filed |
Subjects
Law Enforcement
LICENSE PLATES
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Equipment
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
LICENSE PLATES
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Equipment
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration