TX HB1208 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to lender notice of default to contractors regarding certain construction loans or financing agreements for the improvement of real property and related procedures for suspending contractors' and subcontractors' performance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to lender notice of default to contractors regarding certain construction loans or financing agreements for the improvement of real property and related procedures for suspending contractors' and subcontractors' performance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-04HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-05-01HouseTransferred to Calendars Committee
2015-05-01HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2015-04-30HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2015-04-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-23HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-04-23HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2015-04-23HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-23HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-04-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-03HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2015-03-03HouseRead first time
2015-02-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback