TX HB1207 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the powers and duties of the Kaufman County Fresh Water Supply District No. 1-A; providing authority to issue bonds and levy assessments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the powers and duties of the Kaufman County Fresh Water Supply District No. 1-A; providing authority to issue bonds and levy assessments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1787 (Y: 135 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective immediately
2017-06-15 Filed without the Governor's signature
2017-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-22HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-22HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-22HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenatePassed
2017-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-17SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
2017-05-10SenateRead first time
2017-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HousePassed
2017-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-09HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-24HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-20HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-20HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-30HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-30HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-24HouseRecommendations filed with the Speaker
2017-02-22HouseReferred to Special Purpose Districts
2017-02-22HouseRead first time
2017-01-23HouseTransmitted to the Governor
2017-01-23HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1207
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01207I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01207H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01207E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01207S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01207F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1207&RcdVtNo=1049&Ch=H&Dt=05/09/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1207&RcdVtNo=1787&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=41
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=42

Bill Comments

feedback