TX HB120 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the purchase of food and beverages by the Texas Division of Emergency Management for certain division personnel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the purchase of food and beverages by the Texas Division of Emergency Management for certain division personnel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-04 - House - HB 120Third Reading House (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - SUSPEND ALL NECESSARY RULES (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-01 Effective immediately
2015-06-01 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-22HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-21HouseReported enrolled
2015-05-20HouseSenate passage reported
2015-05-20SenateRecord vote
2015-05-20SenatePassed
2015-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-20SenateRecord vote
2015-05-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2015-05-20SenateLaid before the Senate
2015-05-20SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-12SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-12SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2015-05-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-06SenateReferred to Finance
2015-05-06SenateRead first time
2015-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2015-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2015-05-04HouseRecord vote
2015-05-04HousePassed
2015-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-01HousePassed to engrossment
2015-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-01HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-04-30HouseRecord vote
2015-04-30HouseRules suspended
2015-05-02HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-27HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-04-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-27HouseRecalled from subcommittee
2015-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-15HouseLeft pending in subcommittee
2015-04-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
2015-04-15HouseConsidered by s/c in public hearing
2015-04-15HouseScheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
2015-04-09HouseReferred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair
2015-02-12HouseReferred to Appropriations
2015-02-12HouseRead first time
2014-11-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback