TX HB120 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the issuance of military specialty license plates; providing an exemption from a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the issuance of military specialty license plates; providing an exemption from a fee.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective on 9/1/13
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-17HouseReported enrolled
2013-05-17HouseSenate passage reported
2013-05-17SenateRecord vote
2013-05-17SenatePassed
2013-05-17SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-17SenateRecord vote
2013-05-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2013-05-17SenateLaid before the Senate
2013-05-17SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-15SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2013-05-14SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-05-13SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2013-05-10SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-05-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-05-09SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-09SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-05-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-01SenateLeft pending in committee
2013-05-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-04-18SenateReferred to Transportation
2013-04-18SenateRead first time
2013-04-15SenateReceived from the House
2013-04-12HouseReported engrossed
2013-04-11HouseRecord vote
2013-04-11HousePassed
2013-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2013-04-11HousePassed to engrossment
2013-04-11HouseRead 2nd time
2013-04-11HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2013-04-08HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2013-04-02HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2013-04-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-03-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-03-21HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-03-21HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2013-03-21HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-03-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-02-28HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-02-28HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-02-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-02-28HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-05HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2013-02-05HouseRead first time
2012-11-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback