TX HB120 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of an employment services program to assist certain unemployed or underemployed child support obligors.
Title
Relating to the establishment of an employment services program to assist certain unemployed or underemployed child support obligors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-27 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-26 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-14 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-14 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-14 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-11 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-11 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2011-02-11 | Read first time | |
2010-11-08 | Filed |
Subjects
Family
Family--Child Support
Labor
Labor--Unemployment
Labor--Workforce Development
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Family--Child Support
Labor
Labor--Unemployment
Labor--Workforce Development
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS