TX HB1199 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to public school compliance with dyslexia screening and testing requirements and the reporting of information regarding the number of students who are at risk for or who have dyslexia or a related disorder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to public school compliance with dyslexia screening and testing requirements and the reporting of information regarding the number of students who are at risk for or who have dyslexia or a related disorder.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-11HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-26HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-02-26HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2075 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - Effective immediately

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback