TX HB1198 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the qualifications for certification of a person as a qualified business under the enterprise zone program.
Title
Relating to the qualifications for certification of a person as a qualified business under the enterprise zone program.
Sponsors
Rep. Alma Allen [D] | Rep. Fred Brown [R] | Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. Joe Driver [R] |
Rep. Al Edwards [D] | Rep. Rob Eissler [R] | Rep. Allen Fletcher [R] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
Rep. Carol Kent [D] | Rep. Tim Kleinschmidt [R] | Rep. David Leibowitz [D] | Rep. Doug Miller [R] |
Rep. Solomon Ortiz [D] | Rep. Jim Pitts [R] | Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-11 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-11 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-08 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-05 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-05 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-05 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-09 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-09 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-09 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-09 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Technology, Economic Development & Workforce | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time | |
2009-02-11 | Filed |