TX HB1190 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a required court finding of abuse or neglect before an individual's name is added to the central child abuse or neglect registry.
Title
Relating to a required court finding of abuse or neglect before an individual's name is added to the central child abuse or neglect registry.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Krause [R] | Rep. Gary Gates [R] | Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1603 (Same As) 2021-03-30 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS, STATE OFFICE OF
CHILD ABUSE
Courts
Courts--Civil Procedure
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
CHILD ABUSE
Courts
Courts--Civil Procedure
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection