TX HB1189 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Returned to Calendars Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Returned to Calendars Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the management of commercial oyster boats in this state; amending a provision subject to a criminal penalty.
Title
Relating to the management of commercial oyster boats in this state; amending a provision subject to a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | Returned to Calendars Committee |
2015-05-11 | House | Point of order sustained |
2015-05-11 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-08 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-08 | House | Point of order withdrawn |
2015-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-13 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-17 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-03-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2015-03-03 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
OYSTERS
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE COMMISSION
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--Licenses
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE COMMISSION
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--Licenses