TX HB1171 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to appointment of an attorney ad litem or guardian ad litem to represent an unborn child during a court proceeding authorizing a pregnant minor to consent to an abortion.
Title
Relating to appointment of an attorney ad litem or guardian ad litem to represent an unborn child during a court proceeding authorizing a pregnant minor to consent to an abortion.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-08 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-31 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-31 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2021-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed |